DE HB316 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

This bill amends the Charter of the City of Delaware City. Section 1 changes the maximum repayment term from ten (10) to twenty (20) years for the financing of a capital asset. This change allows for a greater range of borrowing term options for the Citys consideration. Section 2 changes the responsibilities and duties of the City Secretary. Section 3 changes the responsibilities and duties of the City Treasurer. The changes in Sections 2 and 3 allow for improved transparency and separation of duties within the Citys government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend The Charter Of The City Of Delaware City.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-01 Signed by Governor
2018-04-19 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT
2018-04-17 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-04-17 Amendment SA 1 to HB 316 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-03-28 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2018-03-19 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-03-15 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-03-14 Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2018-03-01 Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback