DE HB316 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill amends the Charter of the City of Delaware City. Section 1 changes the maximum repayment term from ten (10) to twenty (20) years for the financing of a capital asset. This change allows for a greater range of borrowing term options for the Citys consideration. Section 2 changes the responsibilities and duties of the City Secretary. Section 3 changes the responsibilities and duties of the City Treasurer. The changes in Sections 2 and 3 allow for improved transparency and separation of duties within the Citys government.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The City Of Delaware City.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-04-19 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2018-04-17 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-04-17 | Amendment SA 1 to HB 316 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-03-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-19 | Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2018-03-15 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-03-14 | Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-01 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |