DE HB314 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act provides for a clear and established procedure and time frame during which public employees may revoke their membership in an employee organization. This Act allows public employers and employee organizations to manage membership status and authorizations in a manner that will meet public employees desires while not disrupting the public employers or employee organizations operations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Public Employment Relations Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-09 Signed by Governor
2018-05-08 Passed By Senate. Votes: 13 YES 8 NO
2018-05-02 Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-04-25 Assigned to Labor Committee in Senate
2018-04-19 Passed By House. Votes: 35 YES 3 NO 3 ABSENT
2018-03-14 Reported Out of Committee (Labor) in House with 1 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
2018-03-01 Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback