DE HB314 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill makes it an unlawful employment practice for an employer to require an employee to not disclose his or her wages.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Unlawful Employment Practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 12 YES 9 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (LABOR & INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Labor & Industrial Relations Committee in Senate |
2016-05-05 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 22 YES 10 NO 3 NOT VOTING 6 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-05 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2016-05-05 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2016-05-04 | House | Reported Out of Committee (LABOR) in House with 3 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits |
2016-04-19 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Labor Committee in House |