DE HB313 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This amendment to the Ocean View charter confirms the authority of the Town Council to elect to assess and value property pursuant to 22 Del.C. ยง 1101, et seq., as an alternate to the previously required procedure.
Title
An Act To Amend Chapter 399, Volume 77, Laws Of Delaware, Entitled An Act To Reincorporate The Town Of Ocean View.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-05-10 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-05-02 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-04-25 | Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2018-04-24 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2018-04-18 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-01 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |