DE HB312 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act includes emergency medical technicians within the definition of employee under the County/Municipal Police/Firefighter Pension Plan.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware County And Municipal Police/firefighter Pension Plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-13 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-05-09 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-28 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2018-03-22 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2018-03-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 2 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2018-01-25 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |