DE HB311 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Passed on July 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Passed on July 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-31 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
During hearings of the Animal Welfare Task Force, established by Senate Concurrent Resolution 44 in the 146th General Assembly, members of the public expressed serious concern about the lack in standardized training and certification of Animal Control Officers (ACOs) and Animal Cruelty Agents (ACAs). ACOs and ACAs in the State of Delaware carry out law enforcement duties, such as issuing warrants, citations, and seizing evidence, yet they are not currently required to have any uniform training and certification. The Animal Welfare Task Force recommended that the Delaware Division of Public Health Office of Animal Welfare develop and implement statewide training and certification of ACOs and ACAs. This will promote safety of the public, officers and animals, reduce the possibility of having inadequately trained officers carrying out law enforcement duties, and enhance consistency in service among agencies. This Act is based upon those recommendations. This Act does not change the animal cruelty standards or investigative authority currently in the Delaware Code. This Act becomes effective upon final publication of the regulations by the Department of Health and Social Services.
Title
An Act To Amend Titles 9, 11, And 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Animals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-31 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |
2014-06-03 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-03 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-06-03 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced in House |
2014-05-07 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 10 On Its Merits |
2014-04-29 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |