DE HB310 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-7)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Laid On Table in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

The Certification of Adoption of Sustainability and Transparency Standards Act (the Act) establishes a voluntary disclosure regime to foster dialogue around sustainability and responsibility among participating Delaware business entities and their various stakeholders. Because issues relating to sustainability and responsibility are fact-specific and fact-intensive and may vary greatly depending on, among other things, the size of the entity, the nature of its business and operations, and the industry in which it operates, the Act does not prescribe specific standards, measures of performance or criteria for evaluating performance. Rather, consistent with the enabling approach of Delaware business laws generally, the Act requires the governing body of each entity seeking certification under the Act to adopt principles, guidelines and standards to guide its business activities in a sustainable and responsible manner, as well as metrics for assessing whether it has met its objectives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 6 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Certification Of Adoption Of Sustainability And Transparency Standards By Delaware Entities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14 Laid On Table in Senate
2018-06-14 Amendment SA 1 to HB 310 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 15 YES 1 NO 5 ABSENT
2018-06-07 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 1 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
2018-05-10 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-05-08 Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 2 NO 2 ABSENT
2018-05-08 Amendment HA 2 to HB 310 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-05-08 Amendment HA 1 to HB 310 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-05-08 Amendment HA 2 to HB 310 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-03-29 Amendment HA 1 to HB 310 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-03-28 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 4 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits
2018-01-25 Introduced in House and Assigned to Judiciary Committee

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback