DE HB31 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill amends the Charter of the Town of Laurel to include in the qualifications for Mayor and Town Councilman, that candidates must be a resident of the Town of Laurel for a minimum of one year. It also amends the section of the charter to include the qualification that the Town Councilman, Town Councilman At Large, and The Mayor may not have been convicted of a felony and each candidate running for office must submit a full background check conducted by the Delaware State Police.
Title
An Act To Amend The Charter Of The Town Of Laurel Relating To The Qualifications For Mayor And Town Councilman.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-14 | House | Vetoed by Governor |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 16 YES 3 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate |
2015-04-02 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-04-01 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 4 On Its Merits |
2015-01-27 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |