DE HB309 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act updates the definition of child care facility to reflect the move of the Office of Child Care Licensing from the Department of Services for Children, Youth & Their Families to the Department of Education.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 19 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Special Employment Practices For Health Care And Child Care Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-30 | Signed by Governor | |
2024-06-20 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2024-03-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2024-03-21 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |
2024-03-21 | Passed By House. Votes: 31 YES 10 ABSENT | |
2024-03-06 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 2 Favorable, 11 On Its Merits | |
2024-02-29 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |