DE HB308 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act removes the sunset provision contained in Volume 80, Chapter 412 of the Laws of Delaware (formerly House Bill No. 405, as amended, of the 148th General Assembly) that is set to expire the law on September 8, 2018. The purpose of Volume 80, Chapter 412 of the Laws of Delaware is to prevent first-time juvenile offenders charged with certain minor misdemeanors from entering into the juvenile criminal justice system by providing law enforcement with a civil citation procedure as an alternative to arrest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Chapter 412, Volume 80 Of The Laws Of Delaware Relating To The Juvenile Offender Civil Citation Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-01 Signed by Governor
2018-04-17 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-04-17 Lifted From Table in Senate
2018-04-17 Laid On Table in Senate
2018-03-28 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2018-03-19 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-01-25 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-01-24 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 2 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable
2018-01-23 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback