DE HB307 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NO
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

United States Supreme Court case law and scientific research has changed how we think about juvenile delinquency. We know now that an adolescents brain is not fully developed until his/her mid-twenties which makes juveniles especially prone to making poor choices. In the landmark case of Miller v. Alabama, wherein the United States Supreme Court prohibited mandatory life sentences without parole for juveniles, the Court wrote: Children are constitutionally different from adults for sentencing purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 10 And 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Juveniles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NO
2018-04-25 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-04-25 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-04-19 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-04-19 Amendment HA 1 to HB 307 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-04-19 Amendment HA 1 to HB 307 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-03-28 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 6 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2018-01-23 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback