DE HB306 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NO
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

This bill permits judges to utilize their discretion in determining whether a juvenile charged with possession of a firearm during commission of a felony should be transferred back to Family Court or remain in Superior Court. Prior to 2017, possession of a firearm during the commission of a felony was only one of five criminal charges where judges had no discretion in determining whether a juvenile should be treated as a juvenile or an adult because the statute required a juvenile charged with these offenses to be prosecuted as an adult. House Bill 9, which was enacted last year, provided judges the discretion to determine how a juvenile should be treated for four other offenses. This is a continuation of that effort.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Certain Crimes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NO
2018-04-25 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-04-18 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-04-17 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2018-04-17 Amendment HA 2 to HB 306 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-04-17 Amendment HA 1 to HB 306 - Stricken in House
2018-04-17 Amendment HA 1 to HB 306 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-03-28 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 7 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits
2018-01-23 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback