DE HB306 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This bill permits judges to utilize their discretion in determining whether a juvenile charged with possession of a firearm during commission of a felony should be transferred back to Family Court or remain in Superior Court. Prior to 2017, possession of a firearm during the commission of a felony was only one of five criminal charges where judges had no discretion in determining whether a juvenile should be treated as a juvenile or an adult because the statute required a juvenile charged with these offenses to be prosecuted as an adult. House Bill 9, which was enacted last year, provided judges the discretion to determine how a juvenile should be treated for four other offenses. This is a continuation of that effort.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Certain Crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-05-03 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 NO | |
2018-04-25 | Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-04-18 | Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2018-04-17 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2018-04-17 | Amendment HA 2 to HB 306 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-04-17 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 306 - Stricken in House | |
2018-04-17 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 306 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2018-03-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 7 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-01-23 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |