DE HB306 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill establishes a fee for lobbyists who fail to file their quarterly expense reports in a timely manner. The purpose of the late filing fee for lobbyist expense reports is to advance the public purpose of timely filing and to compensate the Commission for the extra expenses related to delinquent filers.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Establishment Of Late Filing Fees For Financial Reports For Lobbyist's.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 15 YES 6 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate |
2014-05-08 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-05-07 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 3 On Its Merits |
2014-04-08 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |