DE HB304 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8)
Status: Passed on August 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-8)
Status: Passed on August 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act recognizes advancements in the science of reading and literacy instruction by requiring that all public school students in kindergarten through grade 3 participate in a universal reading screening 3 times each year to identify potential reading deficiencies, including dyslexia, and allow for early intervention and prevention. The Department is tasked with compiling a list of reading screeners as well as literacy intervention approaches that are aligned with the science of reading that charter schools and districts may use. The Department will take into account the science of reading and evidence-based research in creating the list as well as the alignment of screeners and interventions with a multi-tiered system of support. The Department is also required to consider the burden on schools to administer screeners and the amenability of the screener to being incorporated into ongoing instruction.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Reading Competency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-21 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-05-18 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2022-05-12 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |
2022-05-12 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2022-05-12 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 304 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2022-05-10 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 304 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2022-04-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 8 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits | |
2022-03-24 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |