DE HB304 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Defeated By House. Votes: 15 YES 22 NO 4 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act substitutes gender neutral phrases for the ones currently contained in the State Song of Delaware. The proposed changes come at the request of Donn Devine, a retired Brigadier General in the Delaware National Guard and co-author of the State Song of Delaware, who believes that this new phrasing will make the song more relevant to future generations of Delawareans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The State Song.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10 Defeated By House. Votes: 15 YES 22 NO 4 ABSENT
2018-05-10 Amendment HA 1 to HB 304 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-04-25 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2018-03-01 Amendment HA 1 to HB 304 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-01-23 Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback