DE HB301 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill clarifies and establishes procedures for how a contribution by means of a check from a joint bank account should be attributed.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 15 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Elections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | House | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-24 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES/ELECTIONS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Assigned to Administrative Services/Elections Committee in Senate |
2014-06-10 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-10 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-06-10 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Stricken |
2014-06-10 | House | Lifted From Table in House |
2014-06-10 | House | Necessary rules are suspended in House |
2014-06-10 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-06-05 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-06-03 | House | Laid On Table in House |
2014-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 5 On Its Merits |
2014-04-08 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |