DE HB300 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-11)
Status: Passed on August 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-11)
Status: Passed on August 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
This Act establishes a mental health services unit for Delaware middle schools. The unit is phased in over 3 years, beginning in FY2023, to arrive at a final ratio of 250 full-time equivalent students grades 6-8 for a full-time school counselor, school social worker, or licensed clinical social worker. Additionally a unit ratio of 700 full time equivalent students for grades 6-8 for employment of a full-time school psychologist. This Act defines mental health services as prevention, response, and coordination services delivered to students in elementary schools.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Free Public Schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-03 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2022-06-29 | Reported Out of Committee (Finance) in Senate with 2 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-22 | Assigned to Finance Committee in Senate | |
2022-06-22 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2022-06-16 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |
2022-06-16 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2022-06-16 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 300 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2022-06-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 6 On Its Merits | |
2022-03-19 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2022-03-16 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 12 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2022-02-11 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |