DE HB300 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Enrolled on March 8 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 NO
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill makes it a crime to sell, transfer, buy, receive or possess a trigger crank or bump-fire device designed to accelerate the rate of fire of a semiautomatic rifle, making such weapon function more like an automatic weapon. A bump stock was used by the gunman in Las Vegas in October 2017. Violation of this provision is a Class E felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Destructive Weapons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 11 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-01 Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 NO
2018-05-01 Amendment HA 5 to HB 300 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-05-01 Amendment HA 1 to HA 5 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-05-01 Amendment HA 1 to HA 5 to HB 300 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-05-01 Amendment HA 5 to HB 300 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-05-01 Amendment HA 4 to HB 300 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-05-01 Amendment HA 3 to HB 300 - Stricken in House
2018-04-30 Amendment HA 4 to HB 300 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-03-27 Amendment HA 3 to HB 300 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-03-15 Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 1 NO 2 ABSENT
2018-03-15 Amendment SA 4 to HB 300 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-03-15 Amendment SA 3 to HB 300 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 9 YES 11 NO 1 ABSENT
2018-03-15 Amendment SA 2 to HB 300 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-03-15 Amendment SA 1 to HB 300 - Defeated By Senate. Votes: 10 YES 9 NO 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2018-03-14 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-03-09 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-03-08 Passed By House. Votes: 25 YES 3 NO 11 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT
2018-03-08 Amendment HA 2 to HB 300 - Stricken in House
2018-03-08 Amendment HA 1 to HB 300 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-03-08 Amendment HA 1 to HA 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-03-08 Amendment HA 2 to HB 300 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-01-24 Reported Out of Committee (House Administration) in House with 2 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2018-05-01 Passed By House. Votes: 37 YES 4 NO
2018-01-23 Amendment HA 1 to HB 300 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2017-12-14 Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback