DE HB3 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-6)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-6)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill requires that employers receiving contracts from the State shall certify in that contract that, in addition to already mandated fair business practices, the contractor shall ensure that its employees receive equal pay for equal work without regard to sex. The language permits pay differentials when they are based on a seniority system, merit system, or where pay is based on production factors.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To State Procurement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | House | Signed by Governor |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (LABOR & INDUSTRIAL RELATIONS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Labor & Industrial Relations Committee in Senate |
2015-04-30 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2015-04-30 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2015-04-30 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 3 On Its Merits |
2015-04-02 | House | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |