DE HB298 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Passed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Passed on August 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill creates a special license plate for honorably discharged veterans of the United States military.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Special License Or Registration Plates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-28 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-30 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-06-27 | Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-26 | Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate | |
2018-06-26 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2018-04-25 | Reported Out of Committee (Public Safety & Homeland Security) in House with 3 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-01-19 | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |