DE HB296 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on August 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act designates the Golden Retriever as the official dog of Delaware.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Designation Of A State Dog.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-03HouseSigned by Governor
2016-06-28SenatePassed by Senate. Votes: Passed 15 YES 6 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-06-08SenateReported Out of Committee (EXECUTIVE) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2016-05-03SenateAssigned to Executive Committee in Senate
2016-04-21HousePassed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 36 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 5 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2016-04-13HouseReported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 1 Favorable, 4 On Its Merits
2016-03-23HouseIntroduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback