DE HB296 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on July 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

The bill allows professional licensing boards to recognize military education, training and experience when reviewing credentials and issuing licenses and aims to assist service personnel and their spouses in obtaining and/or renewing professional licenses when transitioning from active duty. The bill further allows boards to issue service personnel temporary licenses when he or she holds a valid license from another state. The current Delaware law only allows Boards to do so for military spouses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 29 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Licenses And Permits Issued To Service Members And Their Spouses Under The Authority Of The Division Of Professional Regulation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-05-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-21HouseSigned by Governor
2014-06-18SenatePassed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2014-06-12SenateReported Out of Committee (SUNSET) in Senate with 5 Favorable
2014-06-03SenateAssigned to Sunset Committee in Senate
2014-05-15HousePassed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2014-05-07HouseReported Out of Committee (VETERANS AFFAIRS) in House with 15 On Its Merits
2014-04-10HouseIntroduced in House and assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee
2014-04-10HouseAssigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback