DE HB296 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-22 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill amends section 2306 of Delaware’s probate code as it relates to distribution of the decedent’s personal estate without the grant of letters by the Register of Wills when the decedent’s personal estate is valued at less than $30,000 (“the small estate affidavit”). This bill (1) adds the named executor in a decedent’s will to the category of those persons eligible to distribute the decedent’s personal estate without the grant of letters, and (2) lists the named executor as having the first priority among those persons eligible to distribute the decedent’s personal estate without the grant of letters. The named executor will also have priority over the next of kin to take possession of the decedent's motor vehicles and enter any premises for the purpose of removing from said premises the decedent’s clothing to be used for the burial or viewing of the decedent. This bill also clarifies that, although grant of letters by the Register of Wills is not necessary for estates that meet these qualifications, only the Register of Wills may issue that affidavits attesting to the qualifications set forth in section 2306 (i.e., only the Register of Wills can issue a small estate affidavit).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 12 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Decedents' Estates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-22 Signed by Governor
2010-06-09 Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2010-06-02 Reported Out of Committee (BANKING) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2010-05-04 Assigned to Banking Committee in Senate
2010-04-20 Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
2010-03-24 Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 7 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2010-01-27 Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback