DE HB295 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

This Act amends the Fiscal Year 2018 Bond and Capital Improvements Act to (1) authorize the Department of Transportation to use Community Transportation Funds for one-time reimbursements for various projects; (2) allow reprogramming of funds to support the Delaware Strategic Fund; (3) allow Delaware Technical Community College to realign their critical capital needs with available funding; (4) authorize the Department of Transportation to subordinate the States fee interest in the Project Site; (5) direct the Department of Transportation not to vacate Sheep Pen Road and keep the roadway in the state highways system; and (6) allow Department of Transportation to transfer funds to the Riverfront Development Corporation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend The Laws Of Delaware Relating To The Bond And Capital Improvements Act Of The State Of Delaware And Certain Of Its Authorities For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-14 Signed by Governor
2018-01-25 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2018-01-25 Suspension of Rules in Senate
2018-01-23 Assigned to Capital Improvement Committee in Senate
2018-01-23 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2018-01-16 Introduced in House and Assigned to Capital Infrastructure Committee

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback