DE HB295 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 19 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 19 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-19 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill names the training area of the John P. Mulhern Jr. Emergency Management Operations Center the “James E. Turner, III Educational Center”.
Title
An Act To Name The Training Area Of The John P. Mulhern Jr. Emergency Management Operations Center To The James E. Turner, Iii Educational Center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Assigned to Public Safety Committee in Senate |
2016-03-24 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported Out of Committee (PUBLIC SAFETY & HOMELAND SECURITY) in House with 6 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits |
2016-03-17 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Public Safety & Homeland Security Committee in House |