DE HB295 | 2013-2014 | 147th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill will create a new chapter regarding the safe destruction by business entities of documents containing personal information. Aggrieved customers will have a civil action to recover potential treble damages. In addition, the Attorney General may file suit or bring an administrative enforcement proceeding against the business in violation if it is in the public interest. Banks, financial institutions, and certain other regulated institutions are exempt, as are governments and their subdivisions, agencies and instrumentalities.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 6 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Commerce And Trade And The Safe Destruction Of Documents Containing Personal Identifying Information.
Sponsors
Rep. Stephanie Bolden [D] | Rep. Darryl Scott [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] | Rep. Gerald Brady [D] |
Rep. Ronald Gray [R] | Rep. Charles Potter [D] | Rep. Michael Ramone [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-24 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 1 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-17 | Senate | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced and Placed With the Bill in Senate |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate |
2014-06-03 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 39 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2014-06-03 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-06-03 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2014-05-15 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-05-14 | House | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 5 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits, 1 Unfavorable |
2014-05-14 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2014-04-09 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |