DE HB292 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 21 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act implements the recommendations of the March 2105 Autism Educational Task Force report regarding ยง 1332 of Title 14, the Program for Children with Autism and its Special Staff. Enacted nearly three decades ago, this law established a network of educational programs initially within a separate school structure known as The Delaware Autism Program (DAP). Today, this network continues as a combination of both separate school programs and within local school district support services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Services For Children With Autism Spectrum Disorder.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-06-13 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-06-13 Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
2018-06-12 Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-06-06 Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2018-03-27 Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
2018-03-14 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 4 Favorable, 10 On Its Merits
2018-01-04 Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback