DE HB292 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act implements the recommendations of the March 2105 Autism Educational Task Force report regarding ยง 1332 of Title 14, the Program for Children with Autism and its Special Staff. Enacted nearly three decades ago, this law established a network of educational programs initially within a separate school structure known as The Delaware Autism Program (DAP). Today, this network continues as a combination of both separate school programs and within local school district support services.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Services For Children With Autism Spectrum Disorder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-29 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-06-21 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2018-06-13 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |
2018-06-12 | Passed By House. Votes: 39 YES 2 ABSENT | |
2018-06-06 | Reported Out of Committee (Appropriations) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-27 | Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House | |
2018-03-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 4 Favorable, 10 On Its Merits | |
2018-01-04 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |