DE HB292 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-13 - Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 8 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-13 - Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 8 On Its Merits
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill requires that a background check be completed on a new public school hire before that person begins employment. In an emergency, a person may be hired conditionally prior to the completion of a background check with permission from the school district superintendent or the Secretary of Education. In order to encourage the timely completion of background checks, the bill also requires the background check to be initiated prior to the time of interview for a position.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Public Schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-13 | Reported Out of Committee (EDUCATION) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |
2012-04-25 | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2012-04-05 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2012-04-03 | Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House |