DE HB291 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act clarifies that the representative appointed by the Secretary of the Department of Health and Social Services to the Human Trafficking Interagency Coordinating Council shall serve as the Councils temporary chair for the purposes of organizing the initial meeting of the members. A permanent Chair and Vice Chair are to be elected at the first organizational meeting and shall be elected annually thereafter from among the members of the Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 11 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Human Trafficking.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-14 Signed by Governor
2018-01-25 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-01-24 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-01-17 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-01-11 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2018-01-10 Reported Out of Committee (Judiciary) in House with 3 Favorable, 7 On Its Merits
2018-01-09 Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback