DE HB289 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Enrolled on June 7 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-07 - HS 1 for HB 289 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 14 YES 7 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 7 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-07 - HS 1 for HB 289 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 14 YES 7 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill allows for the hunting of deer on private land on Sundays.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 7 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Hunting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-07 | House | HS 1 for HB 289 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 14 YES 7 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-07 | House | HS 1 for HB 289 - Amendment SA 1 - Defeated by Senate. Votes: Defeated 8 YES 9 NO 4 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-06-07 | House | Amendment SA 1 defeated |
2016-06-07 | House | HS 1 for HB 289 - Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate |
2016-05-19 | House | HS 1 for HB 289 - Reported Out of Committee (NATURAL RESOURCES & ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2016-05-10 | House | HS 1 for HB 289 - Assigned to Natural Resources & Environmental Control Committee in Senate |
2016-05-10 | House | HS 1 for HB 289 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 36 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-10 | House | HS 1 for HB 289 - Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2016-05-10 | House | HS 1 for HB 289 - Amendment HA 2 - Introduced in House |
2016-05-10 | House | HS 1 for HB 289 - Amendment HA 1 - Stricken |
2016-05-10 | House | HS 1 for HB 289 - Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2016-05-04 | House | HS 1 for HB 289 - Reported Out of Committee (AGRICULTURE) in House with 1 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits |
2016-04-28 | House | HS 1 for HB 289 - Assigned to Agriculture |
2016-04-28 | House | Substituted by HS 1 for HB 289 |
2016-04-12 | House | Re-Assigned to Agriculture Committee in House |
2016-03-16 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Natural Resources Committee in House |