DE HB288 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act adds direct-to-home satellite services to the public utility tax base and increases tax rates on public utilities other than cable television.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Public Utility Taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-07-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-06-30 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 3 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 1 VACANT | |
2009-06-23 | Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2009-06-29 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 26 YES 15 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-29 | Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2009-06-29 | Introduced in House |