DE HB287 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Substitute Bill makes the following changes to House Bill No. 287:
Title
An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To State High School Diploma Requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Signed by Governor | |
2018-03-29 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2018-03-28 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-20 | Assigned to Education Committee in Senate | |
2018-03-20 | Passed By House. Votes: 34 YES 4 NO 2 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT | |
2018-03-20 | Amendment HA 1 to HS 1 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2018-03-14 | Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 11 On Its Merits | |
2018-03-06 | Adopted in lieu of the original bill HB 287, and Assigned to Education Committee in House |