DE HB286 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on January 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Enactment of the Every Student Succeeds Act amended the Individuals with Disability Education Act (IDEA) by mandating that special education teachers must have obtained full certification and may not be working under emergency certifications. The Delaware Department of Education must stop issuing emergency certifications in special education in order for for the State to continue receiving $36 million in federal IDEA funding for our schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Educator Licensure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-29 Signed by Governor
2018-01-25 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2018-01-24 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits
2018-01-23 Assigned to Education Committee in Senate
2018-01-23 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2018-01-23 Amendment HA 1 to HB 286 - Passed In House by Voice Vote
2018-01-17 Reported Out of Committee (Education) in House with 11 On Its Merits
2018-01-09 Amendment HA 1 to HB 286 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2018-01-04 Introduced and Assigned to Education Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback