DE HB284 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Bill would allow all on-premises licensees who sell a bottle of alcohol (other than beer) to place a cap on the bottle and allow patrons to take it home with them for consumption later. Delaware was one of the first states to recognize that it was important that patrons who purchase a bottle of wine have the opportunity to take the remainder of the bottle home with them rather than face the choice of drinking more than they should and driving, or leaving part of the bottle they had paid for at the premise.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 4 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Removal Of Partially Consumed Alcoholic Liquors From A Premise.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29 Signed by Governor
2018-04-18 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT
2018-03-28 Reported Out of Committee (Elections & Government Affairs) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2018-03-09 Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-03-06 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 NO
2018-01-24 Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce) in House with 1 Favorable, 8 On Its Merits
2018-01-04 Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback