DE HB284 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill requires pharmacy benefit managers who employ “maximum allowable cost,” or “MAC” pricing for multi-sourced drugs to follow set standards in composing and updating the list, to provide information on MAC and how it is determined to pharmacies in their networks, and to create an appeal process for a participating pharmacy who believes the MAC has been set in error. This bill will encourage more efficient operation of the prescription drug market by setting ground rules and encouraging transparency, resulting in savings to consumers and protecting pharmacies who are small businesses. Similar laws have been passed in at least 11 states. These new rules surrounding MAC pricing will be subchapter II of Chapter 33A, which was added to the code last year to address pharmacy audits conducted by pharmacy benefit managers. A conforming change is made so that the definition of pharmacy benefit manager is consistent across both subchapters.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 18 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Pharmacy Benefit Managers.
Sponsors
Rep. Bryon Short [D] | Sen. Margaret Henry [D] | Rep. Ronald Gray [R] | Rep. Paul Baumbach [D] |
Rep. John Kowalko [D] | Rep. Charles Potter [D] | Sen. Catherine Cloutier [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 19 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 2 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate |
2016-05-05 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-05 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Passed in House by Voice Vote |
2016-05-05 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Stricken |
2016-04-21 | House | Amendment HA 2 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2016-04-14 | House | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill |
2016-03-16 | House | Reported Out of Committee (ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT/BANKING/INSURANCE/COMMERCE) in House with 8 On Its Merits |
2016-03-10 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |