DE HB280 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-6)
Status: Passed on January 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-6)
Status: Passed on January 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Act commits discretion over the length of certified nursing assistant training and orientation programs to the Secretary of the Department of Health and Human Services. This change will facilitate the rapid certification of National Guard members as certified nursing assistants (CNAs) by allowing the Department of Health and Social Services to establish the total required classroom and clinical training and mandatory facility-specific orientation hours. Modeled after a Minnesota initiative, eligible guard members will participate in rapid certification programs through DelTech and be deployed to provide temporary staffing in long term care facilities experiencing staffing shortages under MOUs entered will the facilities. National Guard members have served as a critical part of the states response efforts throughout the COVID-19 pandemic. Training and deploying National Guard soldiers to work as CNAs will help relieve staffing shortages in health care settings and facilitate the transfer of patients out of Delawares hospitals to free up in-patient bed space.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Regulatory Provisions Concerning Public Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-24 | Signed by Governor | |
2022-01-19 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2022-01-19 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 4 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |
2022-01-13 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2022-01-13 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |
2022-01-11 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 9 Favorable, 3 On Its Merits | |
2022-01-06 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |