DE HB280 | 2015-2016 | 148th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill creates a special license plate for recipients of the Bronze Star without valor. A surviving spouse may keep the plate after the medal recipient has passed.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Special License Plates Or Registration Plates.
Sponsors
Rep. Earl Jaques [D] | Sen. Bruce Ennis [D] | Rep. Ronald Gray [R] | Rep. William Outten [R] |
Sen. David Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee (HIGHWAYS & TRANSPORTATION) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Assigned to Highways & Transportation Committee in Senate |
2016-04-19 | House | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 37 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT |
2016-03-09 | House | Reported Out of Committee (VETERANS AFFAIRS) in House with 1 Favorable, 15 On Its Merits |
2016-03-08 | House | Introduced and Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in House |