DE HB280 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This Act amends the Charter for the Town of Newport by: 1.) eliminating the requirement that a resident of the Town of Newport must have paid all taxes to hold the office of Mayor or Commissioner; 2.) changing the date of the organizational meeting for the Town of Newport from the second Monday in April to the third Thursday in April; 3.) providing for a method to allow the Town of Newport to create an earlier due date for payment of taxes; 4.) updating Charter language for a Town Alderman; 5.) addressing sidewalk maintenance; and 6.) providing for Charter changes through the General Assembly.
Title
An Act To Amend Chapter 214, Volume 65 Of The Laws Of Delaware, As Amended, Relating To The Charter Of The Town Of Newport.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-08 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 38 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 3 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-05-03 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-05-03 | Amendment SA 1 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-05-03 | Amendment SA 1 - Introduced in Senate | |
2012-04-25 | Reported Out of Committee (COMMUNITY/COUNTY AFFAIRS) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2012-04-03 | Assigned to Community/County Affairs Committee in Senate | |
2012-03-29 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-03-29 | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2012-03-29 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2012-03-28 | Reported Out of Committee (HOUSE ADMINISTRATION) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |
2012-03-20 | Introduced and Assigned to House Administration Committee in House |