DE HB28 | 2021-2022 | 151st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill increases the minimum amount of property damage that triggers the mandatory reporting of a vehicular collision to police from $500 to $2,000. This bill also increases the minimum amount of property damage requiring police agencies to investigate from $1,000 to $2,000. This increase makes Delaware more consistent with other states and reflects the Legislatures intention in 1997 to increase the amount annually by $100.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 21 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Reports Of Accidents.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-30 Signed by Governor
2021-06-29 Passed By Senate. Votes: 20 YES 1 ABSENT
2021-04-28 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits
2021-03-18 Assigned to Transportation Committee in Senate
2021-03-18 Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES
2021-03-12 Suspension of Rules in House
2021-01-13 Reported Out of Committee (Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure) in House with 3 Favorable, 5 On Its Merits
2020-12-11 Introduced and Assigned to Transportation/Land Use and Infrastructure Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback