DE HB28 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Banking, Business & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate
Pending: Senate Banking, Business & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This bill clarifies definitions relating to airbags, counterfeit supplemental restraint system components, nonfunctional airbags, and supplemental restraint systems, and prohibited trade practices.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 6 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Auto Repair Fraud Prevention, And Prohibited Trade Practices.
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Briggs King [R] | Sen. Catherine Cloutier [R] | Sen. Brian Pettyjohn [R] | Sen. David Wilson [R] |
Rep. Edward Osienski [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Assigned to Banking, Business & Insurance Committee in Senate | |
2020-01-28 | Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 3 ABSENT | |
2020-01-28 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 28 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |
2019-01-24 | Amendment HA 1 to HB 28 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2019-01-23 | Reported Out of Committee (Economic Development/Banking/Insurance & Commerce) in House with 12 On Its Merits | |
2019-01-04 | Introduced and Assigned to Economic Development/Banking/Insurance/Commerce Committee in House |