DE HB277 | 2017-2018 | 149th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act extends the Delaware Manufactured Home Relocation Trust Fund until July 1, 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 25 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Delaware Manufactured Home Relocation Trust Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-17 Signed by Governor
2018-03-14 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2018-03-14 Lifted From Table in Senate
2018-03-13 Laid On Table in Senate
2018-01-24 Reported Out of Committee (Judicial & Community Affairs) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits
2018-01-17 Assigned to Judicial & Community Affairs Committee in Senate
2018-01-16 Passed By House. Votes: 38 YES 1 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT
2018-01-10 Reported Out of Committee (Manufactured Housing) in House with 4 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits
2017-12-14 Introduced and Assigned to Manufactured Housing Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback