DE HB275 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Passed on March 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This bill permits the owner of a beer garden or food establishment to permit leashed dogs on licensed outdoor patios of food establishments and in beer gardens.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 16 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Deparment Of Health And Social Services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03 Signed by Governor
2020-01-30 Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 1 NO 1 ABSENT
2020-01-29 Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 3 On Its Merits
2020-01-16 Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate
2020-01-16 Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT
2020-01-15 Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits
2019-08-30 Introduced and Assigned to Administration Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback