DE HB269 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on July 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on July 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
This bill authorizes and requires that DSCYF run a credit report for each child in its care within 30 days of the child’s 16th and 17th birthdays. DSCYF will then review the credit report for any possible identity theft.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 13 Of The Delaware Code Relating To The Powers And Duties Of The Department Of Services For Children, Youth And Their Families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-25 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-06-26 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 21 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-05-03 | Reported Out of Committee (CHILDREN; YOUTH & FAMILIES) in Senate with 4 On Its Merits | |
2012-03-28 | Assigned to Children; Youth & Families Committee in Senate | |
2012-03-22 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 40 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 1 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-03-22 | Amendment HA 1 - Passed in House by Voice Vote | |
2012-03-22 | Amendment HA 1 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |
2012-03-14 | Reported Out of Committee (HEALTH & HUMAN DEVELOPMENT) in House with 2 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2012-03-08 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |