DE HB268 | 2023-2024 | 152nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-10-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on October 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-10-23 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
House Bill No. 303, with House Amendment No. 2, from the 151st General Assembly created an annual behavioral health well check and required carriers to provide coverage for this service.
Title
An Act To Amend Title 31 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Annual Behavioral Health Well Checks.
Sponsors
Sen. Nicole Poore [D] | Rep. Nnamdi Chukwuocha [D] | Rep. Debra Heffernan [D] | Rep. Kendra Johnson [D] |
Rep. DeShanna Neal [D] | Rep. William Bush [D] | Rep. Kerri Harris [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-10-23 | Signed by Governor | |
2024-06-27 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |
2024-03-20 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 6 On Its Merits | |
2024-01-23 | Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate | |
2024-01-23 | Passed By House. Votes: 40 YES 1 ABSENT | |
2024-01-10 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Human Development) in House with 6 Favorable, 6 On Its Merits | |
2024-01-04 | Introduced and Assigned to Health & Human Development Committee in House |