DE HB268 | 2009-2010 | 145th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-30 - HS 1 for HB 268 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 1 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on June 30 2009 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-30 - HS 1 for HB 268 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 1 VACANT
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
Section 1 is intended to establish a Voluntary Compliance Initiative for eligible taxes administered by the Division of Revenue for a period running from September 1, 2009 through October 30, 2009. Any taxpayer who has a current outstanding liability for tax periods before January 1, 2009 and makes payment during the Initiative period or enters into a payment plan and makes payment before June 30, 2010 will have penalty and interest for late filing the return waived. Any non filer who files returns will have any tax, penalty and interest for non filed returns for any period prior to January 1, 2004 waived. Section 2 is intended to remove the 50% limitation on the penalty for failure to file timely tax returns due for tax periods ending after December 31, 2008. Section 3 is intended to remove the 75% limitation on the penalty for any fraudulent tax returns filed for tax periods ending after December 31, 2008.
Title
An Act To Amend Chapter 5, Title 30 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Procedure, Administration And Enforcement.
Sponsors
Sen. Thurman Adams [D] | Sen. Patricia Blevins [D] | Sen. Nancy Cook [D] | Sen. Anthony DeLuca [D] |
Rep. Robert Gilligan [D] | Rep. Valerie Longhurst [D] | Rep. Peter Schwartzkopf [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-30 | HS 1 for HB 268 - Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 20 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 1 VACANT | |
2009-06-30 | HS 1 for HB 268 - Necessary rules are suspended in Senate | |
2009-06-29 | HS 1 for HB 268 - Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2009-06-29 | HS 1 for HB 268 - Necessary rules are suspended in House | |
2009-06-24 | Reported Out of Committee (REVENUE & FINANCE) in House with 6 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |
2009-06-22 | Introduced and Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee in House |