DE HB266 | 2011-2012 | 146th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on May 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]
Summary
This Bill removes a provision by which either the Chief Justice of the Supreme Court or the Deputy Administrator for the Justice of the Peace Court was required to verify the final disposition of a case before a previously paid fine could be refunded. This Bill changes the practice in the Justice of the Peace Court to mirror that of the Court of Common Pleas, allowing the court clerk, subject to the internal controls now in place in the Court, to verify the final disposition of a case when a fine should be refunded.
Title
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-21 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-16 | Passed by Senate. Votes: Passed 17 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 4 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-05-01 | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in Senate with 5 On Its Merits | |
2012-03-22 | Assigned to Judiciary Committee in Senate | |
2012-03-20 | Passed by House of Representatives. Votes: Passed 41 YES 0 NO 0 NOT VOTING 0 ABSENT 0 VACANT | |
2012-03-14 | Reported Out of Committee (JUDICIARY) in House with 8 On Its Merits | |
2012-03-08 | Introduced and Assigned to Judiciary Committee in House |