DE HB265 | 2019-2020 | 150th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-29 - Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [HTML]

Summary

This Act fully exempts county property taxes and local school taxes for a disabled veteran with a 100% VA rated service-connected, permanent and total disability or for a disabled veteran who is receiving 100% disability compensation due to individual unemployability. The 100% rating and disability compensation is determined by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs. This Act sets forth the minimum requirements that a claimant in any county must meet in determining eligibility for the exemption. Each county may impose additional requirements as necessary for eligibility. The minimum requirements are as follows: (1) the disabled veteran must be legally domiciled in the State for a period of time established by the county; and (2) the property for which the exemption is sought must be solely owned by the disabled veteran (or jointly with spouse) and used as his or her primary place of residence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Amend Title 9 And 14 Of The Delaware Code Relating To Exemptions From Taxation On Real Property.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-29 Assigned to Appropriations Committee in House
2020-01-15 Reported Out of Committee (Veterans Affairs) in House with 14 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits
2020-01-09 Amendment HA 1 to HB 265 - Introduced and Placed With Bill
2019-12-12 Introduced and Assigned to Veterans Affairs Committee in House

Delaware State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback